+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HSH/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-15 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HSH/HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 88).
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 512) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-18-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 8
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor