+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 197) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-21.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor