+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 122, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224).
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Act 122, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 118).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 118) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Luke, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 4:33PM in conference room 224.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Luke Co-Chairs; Thielen.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 791) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Ihara, Inouye, Kim, Moriwaki, Ruderman. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from EET/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1899) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki, Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Kidani, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-19 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EET/WAM.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on EET deferred the measure.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 229).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor