+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EET/CPH, JDL/WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/CPN, JDL/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 241).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, Keohokalole, LoPresti, McKelvey, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, Matsumoto, McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-15 at 2:15 PM in room 325.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-05-15 2:15PM in conference room 325.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 250) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-09-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor