+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 81, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Act 081, on 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 177).
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 177) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ige, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Takumi, Johanson.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 533) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1350) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:10AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 284).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 816) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-08-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 212).
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor