+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HOU/JDL, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HSH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen.
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HSH/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 238).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 803) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 360) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-02-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor