+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Galuteria, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Cullen, Thielen.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 411) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-27-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1051) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-19-13 9:15AM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 283).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to CPN.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 850) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Evans, Har.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 282) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor