+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 3:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to ENE, CPN.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 282).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 736) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Evans, Har.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor