+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-15 9:00AM in conference room 312.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-15.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-02-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor