+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor