+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 186, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1300).
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Act 186, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1300).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Inouye, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 329.
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Luke, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 184) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 184).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Inouye, Tokuda Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 609) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1534) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1127) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English.
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 2:10PM in conference room 414.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/TRE, WAM.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 43).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy.
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 488) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:03PM in House conference room 309.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 21, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor