+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-15 11:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-15 11:30AM.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Saturday, 02-07-15 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor