+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-17 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-17 at 11:00AM.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 21, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor