+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.