+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-13.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-04-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.