+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 12
- Recommitted to AGR as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
- Recommends recommittal to AGR.
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) as amended in HD 1.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-01-17 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor