+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-13-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 85), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.