+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 407).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1158) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.