+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed on 07-08-13 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13 (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Hashem, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 137) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 137).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Ruderman, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Evans, Lowen Co-Chairs; Hashem, Cheape.
- Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from PSM/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 9:55AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM/WAM.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 149).
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-11-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor