+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 781) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1881) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 76).
- Passed First Reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa.
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:35PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Quinlan.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor