+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor