+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor