+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Act 207, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 207, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 57) as amended in (CD 1).
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, C. Lee, Hashimoto, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, K. Rhoads, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 57).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 10:40AM in conference room 225.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Harimoto, Wakai, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Say, McDermott.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 779) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1942) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 220).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-13-19.
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 292) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor