+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/TCA, JDC.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Takenouchi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila, Kong voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Lamosao, Alcos, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
On February 25, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward.
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Thursday, 02-09-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/EEP, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor