+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 225.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; English, Kim, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Say, McDermott.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 778) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1861) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 218).
- Referred to TRS, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor