+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tupola.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-11-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor