+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 103, 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1204).
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Act 103, on 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1204).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 21-14).
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 21-14) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday, 04-23-14 at 3:20PM in Conference Room 224.
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 9:35AM in conference room 224.
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 04-24-14 9:35AM in conference room 224.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 9:35AM in conference room 224.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 12:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-15-14 3:30PM in conference room 224.
- House Conferees Appointed: Wooley, Onishi Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Matsumoto Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom Member.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 510) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3377) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2903) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 205).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 127) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor