+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 127) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor