+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 10, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-10-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to ECD, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor