+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-02-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor