+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-15.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.