+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 415) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor