+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB/TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/TOU on Friday, 02-13-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB/TOU, CPC, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor