+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 400) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor