+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 01-25-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 1
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor