+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor