+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 12).
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ing voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 236) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor