+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:03PM in Conference Room 423.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 423.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on Friday 05/01/15 2:00PM in conference room 423
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 10:05AM in conference room 423.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 9:30AM in conference room 423.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 9:30AM in conference room 423.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Brower, Cachola Co-Chairs; Kong, Ohno, Ward.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kahele Chair; Wakai, English Co-Chairs; Galuteria, Slom.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 569) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1493) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from TSI/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz.
- The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Tokuda.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TSI/EDT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 218).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from EDB/TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 296) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/TOU on Friday, 02-13-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB/TOU, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor