+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Sayama, Okimoto.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 704) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1627) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 72).
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
- Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 322) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor