+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.