+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 48) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-02-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.