+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 3:00pm in Conference Room 423.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:30AM in conference room 423.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 2:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 2:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s).
- Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Wakai, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Luke Co-Chairs; Choy, Fale.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 470) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1392) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EGH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 984) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda.
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
- Re-Referred to EGH/TEC, WAM.
- Re-Referred to EGH, WAM.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH/TEC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH/TEC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 167).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 778) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor