+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 5, 2023 in the House:
- Act 214, on 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
On July 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Act 214, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 18) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 18).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Nakashima, Cochran, Sayama, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai, Rhoads, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-23 9:20AM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
On April 21, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-23 11:05AM in conference room 325.
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Cochran, Sayama, Ward.
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Wakai, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Richards.
On April 17, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 892).
On April 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 772) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa.
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/PSM, JDC.
- The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 329).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi.
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:45AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.