+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 02-11-13 3:30PM in conference room 325.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 4
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor