+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 141), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Matsumoto.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor