+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 183-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor