+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-17 11:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-17 at 11:30AM.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-17 at 10:00AM.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-02-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.