+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (55)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 240, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Act 240, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Eli, Har, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Kong, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Ohno, Okimoto, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, Tarnas, Tokioka, Ward voting no (17) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Johanson, Cullen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 110) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 110).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads, English Co-Chairs; Nishihara, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Johanson, C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen.
- Re-referred to HLT, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 768) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1958) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDC/WAM has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1461) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:20AM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 68).
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 916), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Eli, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 752) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 231) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:45AM in House conference room 329.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.