+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 016.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; K. Kahele.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Woodson, Luke Co-Chairs; Tupola.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 603) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
- The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EDU, CPH/WAM.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/CPH/HMS, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 140).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 847), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 718) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-02-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor