+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-10-23 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 98) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato.
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, HET, CPC, referral sheet 2
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-01-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor